EP4140935 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN AUTONOMOUS MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STILL GmbH Berzeliusstraße 10 22113 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Linde Material Handling GmbH Carl-von-Linde-Platz 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | [2023/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUMBHOLZ, Peter 63869 Jakobsthal / DE | 02 /
GROH, Jonas 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | 03 /
HÜBNER, Rainer 22085 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
PÜTZ, Daniel 22049 Hamburg / DE | [2023/09] | Representative(s) | Patentship Patentanwaltgesellschaft Schertlinstraße 29 86159 Augsburg / DE | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 22166802.3 | 05.04.2022 | [2023/09] | Priority number, date | DE202110110227 | 22.04.2021 Original published format: DE102021110227 | DE202110112405 | 12.05.2021 Original published format: DE102021112405 | [2023/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4140935 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/06, B65G1/137, G06Q10/00, G07C11/00, G05D1/00, B65G43/00, B66F9/075, B25J9/16, G05B19/418 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
G05D1/0246 (EP);
B66F9/063 (EP);
B66F9/0755 (EP);
G06Q10/20 (EP);
B25J9/162 (EP);
B25J9/1694 (EP);
B65G1/1371 (EP);
B65G2207/40 (EP);
B65G43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] |
Former [2023/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES AUTONOMEN FLURFÖRDERZEUGS | [2023/09] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING AN AUTONOMOUS MOTOR VEHICLE | [2023/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN CHARIOT DE MANUTENTION AUTONOME | [2023/09] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 31.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1898290 (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [A] 12-15* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]JP2011057334 (KONGO KK) [A] 6,8 * abstract *; | [I]DE102015220044 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1,2,6,9,11 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0041]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2018029797 (HANCE CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 5 * paragraph [0031]; claim 1 *; | [XI]CN108114392 (HEFEI CHAOFAN EXPRESS CONSULTING CO LTD JIESHOU BUSINESS DEPT) [X] 1,6,11 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,9; | [A]US10289111 (ROMANO JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 6,8 * column 2 - column 24; figures 1a,5a-5f *; | [XI]DE102019201313 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,11 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-11 * [I] 5,8,12-15; | [XI]EP3530601 (INTELLIGRATED HEADQUARTERS LLC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,8-11 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0099]; figures 1-10 * [I] 12-15; | [A]JP2020152514 (SUMITOMO HEAVY IND MAT HANDLING SYSTEMS CO LTD) [A] 6,8 * abstract *; | [I]CN111882710 (SHANGHAI MROBOT JUZONG ROBOT TECH CO LTD) [I] 1,2,6,9,11 * the whole document *; | [XP]EP3875990 (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [XP] 1-6,11 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1-7 * |