EP4138455 - COMMUNICATION PATH SWITCHING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Hui Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | 02 /
OUYANG, Guowei Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | 03 /
LI, Guorong Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | [2023/08] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/08] | Application number, filing date | 22166856.9 | 22.06.2016 | [2023/08] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4138455 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04W36/36, H04W88/04 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
H04W36/36 (EP,CN,US);
H04W40/34 (CN);
H04W36/0055 (EP,CN,US);
H04W40/12 (CN);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W8/08 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2023/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSWEG-SCHALTVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2023/08] | English: | COMMUNICATION PATH SWITCHING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2023/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION DE VOIE DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/08] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 18.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16905831.0 / EP3445087 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2903390 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]); |