EP4079664 - OVERHEAD SWEEP REJECTER FOR A CONVEYOR LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo, LLC 1900 Polaris Parkway Columbus OH 43240 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kania, Michal Rybnik / PL | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Mettler-Toledo IP Department Im Langacher 44 8606 Greifensee / CH | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 22166880.9 | 06.04.2022 | [2022/43] | Priority number, date | US202117233609 | 19.04.2021 Original published format: US202117233609 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079664 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/82 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B65G47/82 (EP,US);
B07C5/362 (CN);
B07C5/38 (CN);
B65G47/42 (US);
B65G2203/0258 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] |
Former [2022/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERKOPFABWEISER FÜR EINE FÖRDERANLAGE | [2022/43] | English: | OVERHEAD SWEEP REJECTER FOR A CONVEYOR LINE | [2022/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REJET DE BALAYAGE AÉRIEN POUR UNE LIGNE DE CONVOYAGE | [2022/43] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 10.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 10.05.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.05.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 10.05.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.05.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE1184279 (RALFS KG ORG) [X] 1 * column 3 - column 4 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 2-10; | [XAI]US3568814 (GATES JOHNNIE L, et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1 - column 2 * * figures 1-2 * [A] 2-6,8-10 [I] 7; | [XA]US4440289 (WEIS RUDOLF R [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 2 - column 3 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 2-10; | [XAY]WO2006059944 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 2 - page 5 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2-9 [Y] 10; | [Y]US10814355 (KANIA MICHAL [US]) [Y] 10 * abstract * * column 1 - column 3 ** figures 1-2 * |