EP4258086 - CALIBRATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR AN ELECTRONIC DISPLAY SCREEN FOR TOUCHLESS GESTURE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERIA AG Palo-Alto-Platz 1 69124 Heidelberg / DE | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILKHOVYI, Igor 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 02 /
SEILER, Martin 79238 Ehrenkirchen / DE | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Best, Bastian Bestpatent Patentanwalt Bastian Best Konrad-Zuse-Platz 8 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/41] | Banzhaf, Felicita Banzhaf IP Möhringer Landstraße 65 70563 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 22167385.8 | 08.04.2022 | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4258086 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/03, G06V10/24 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/0304 (EP);
G06V10/245 (EP);
G06V40/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2023/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KALIBRIERUNG EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN ANZEIGEBILDSCHIRMS ZUR BERÜHRUNGSLOSEN GESTENSTEUERUNG | [2023/41] | English: | CALIBRATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR AN ELECTRONIC DISPLAY SCREEN FOR TOUCHLESS GESTURE CONTROL | [2023/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTALONNAGE D'UN ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR COMMANDE DE GESTE SANS CONTACT | [2023/41] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 22.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2019114801 (SHIMAOKA YUUSAKU [JP], et al) [X] 1,9-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0023] - [0060] - [0068] - [0078] - [0083] * [A] 2,4 [I] 3,5-8; | [A]EP3508812 (ZEISS CARL INDUSTRIELLE MESSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0091] - [0133] - [0141] , [0142] , [0151] , [0157] , [0161] , [0164] , [0172] , [0175] * | by applicant | WO2015139969 |