EP4049625 - PROSTHETIC HEART VALVE HAVING IMPROVED COMMISSURE SUPPORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Lifesciences Corporation One Edwards Way Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOHANAN, Ziv IRVINE, CA 92614 / US | 02 /
LEVI, Tamir S. IRVINE, CA 92614 / US | 03 /
BENICHOU, Netanel IRVINE, CA 92614 / US | 04 /
BUKIN, Michael IRVINE, CA 92614 / US | 05 /
GUROVICH, Nikolay IRVINE, CA 92614 / US | 06 /
SHERMAN, Elena IRVINE, CA 92614 / US | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 22167523.4 | 07.12.2012 | [2022/35] | Priority number, date | US201161569022P | 09.12.2011 Original published format: US 201161569022 P | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049625 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/2409 (CN,US);
A61F2/2412 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/2433 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2230/0013 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | HERZKLAPPENPROTHESE MIT VERBESSERTEN KOMMISSURSTÜTZEN | [2022/35] | English: | PROSTHETIC HEART VALVE HAVING IMPROVED COMMISSURE SUPPORTS | [2022/35] | French: | VALVULE CARDIAQUE PROTHÉTIQUE AYANT DES SUPPORTS DE COMMISSURES AMÉLIORÉS | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 29.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2024 | 12.03.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2024 | 13.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12855055.5 / EP2787926 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009157175 (BENICHOU NETANEL [IL]); | [A]US2010049313 (ALON DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2010249923 (ALKHATIB YOUSEF F [US], et al); | [AP]US2012078357 (CONKLIN BRIAN S [US]) | by applicant | US5411522 | US6730118 | US2010049313 | US7993394 |