EP4084382 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MULTIPLEXING UPLINK CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SABER, Hamid San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 02 /
BAE, Jung Hyun San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 22167561.4 | 11.04.2022 | [2022/44] | Priority number, date | US202163182395P | 30.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163182395 P | US202163186691P | 10.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163186691 P | US202217709311 | 30.03.2022 Original published format: US202217709311 | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4084382 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H04L1/1854 (EP,KR);
H04W72/1268 (CN,KR);
H04L5/0055 (CN,KR);
H04W72/569 (KR,US);
H04L1/1664 (KR);
H04L1/1812 (CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1861 (EP,KR);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (KR);
H04L5/0051 (KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04L5/0064 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR MULTIPLEXIERUNG VON UPLINK-KANÄLEN | [2022/44] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MULTIPLEXING UPLINK CHANNELS | [2022/44] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MULTIPLEXAGE DE CANAUX DE LIAISON MONTANTE | [2022/44] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 28.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2020202068 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [YA]US2020367265 (WANG YI [CN], et al); |