EP4261164 - HOLDER UNIT FOR USE IN A WEB CHANGER OF TOBACCO INDUSTRY MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Tobacco Machinery Poland SP. Z O.O. Andrzeja Stanikowskiego 2 26-600 Radom / PL | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIKORA, Leszek 26-600 Radom / PL | 02 /
FIGARSKI, Radoslaw 26-600 Radom / PL | 03 /
CIESLIKOWSKI, Bartosz 26-400 Przysucha / PL | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Markieta, Jaroslaw Franciszek Kancelaria Rzeczników Patentowych J. Markieta, M. Zielinska-Lazarowicz Sp. p. Bukowinska 2 lok 160 02-703 Warszawa / PL | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 22168104.2 | 13.04.2022 | [2023/42] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4261164 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/18, A24C5/20 | [2024/37] | CPC: |
B65H19/1821 (EP);
A24C5/20 (EP);
B65H2301/46022 (EP);
B65H2301/4621 (EP);
B65H2301/4633 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/42] | B65H19/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] |
Former [2023/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM BAHNWECHSLER DER TABAKVERARBEITENDEN INDUSTRIE | [2023/42] | English: | HOLDER UNIT FOR USE IN A WEB CHANGER OF TOBACCO INDUSTRY MATERIAL | [2023/42] | French: | UNITÉ DE SUPPORT DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS UN DISPOSITIF DE CHANGEMENT DE BANDE DE MATÉRIAU DE L'INDUSTRIE DU TABAC | [2023/42] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 18.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2205867 (SCOTT WALTER C); | [XA]US3172613 (SIMONS JACOBUS M, et al); | [XAI]US2008230646 (MORELLI ALESSANDRO [IT], et al) | by applicant | EP1389602 | EP1437055 | WO2015173275 |