EP4089542 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FINE GRANULAR RETENTION CONTROL IN STORAGE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Dongwan San Jose, CA, 95134 / US | 02 /
KACHARE, Ramdas P. San Jose, CA, 95134 / US | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 22168156.2 | 13.04.2022 | [2022/46] | Priority number, date | US202163187919P | 12.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163187919 P | US202117366017 | 01.07.2021 Original published format: US202117366017 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4089542 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
G06F12/0246 (EP,KR);
G06F3/0659 (KR);
G11C29/42 (CN);
G06F3/0655 (US);
G06F12/0646 (KR);
G06F3/0604 (KR,US);
G06F3/0611 (KR);
G06F3/0614 (KR);
G06F3/0679 (US);
G06F12/0253 (US);
G06F2212/702 (US);
G06F2212/7201 (EP);
G06F2212/7202 (EP);
G06F2212/7205 (US);
G06F2212/7209 (EP);
G06F2212/7211 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] |
Former [2022/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR FEINKÖRNIGEN RETENTIONSREGELUNG IN SPEICHERVORRICHTUNGEN | [2022/46] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FINE GRANULAR RETENTION CONTROL IN STORAGE DEVICES | [2022/46] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE LA RÉTENTION GRANULAIRE FINE DANS DES DISPOSITIFS DE STOCKAGE | [2022/46] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 11.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013275391 (BATWARA ASHISH [US], et al); | [A]US2016170871 (HYUN JEA WOONG [US], et al); | [XI]US2018074730 (INOUE KAZUKI [JP], et al); | [XI]US2019018604 (CHOI INSEOK STEPHEN [US], et al); | [A]US10949113 (CAI YU [US], et al) |