EP4047841 - METHOD FOR MEASURING SENSING RANGE OF VEHICLE, APPARATUS AND MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT, SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apollo Intelligent Driving Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 105, 1st floor, building 1 No.10, shangdishi street Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONG, Guohao Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Junping Beijing, 100085 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Tiankun Beijing, 100085 / CN | 04 /
GAO, Dongchao Beijing, 100085 / CN | 05 /
WU, Zelin Beijing, 100085 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Chengfa Beijing, 100085 / CN | 07 /
SUN, Yongyi Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/04] |
Former [2022/34] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22168251.1 | 26.03.2020 | [2022/34] | Priority number, date | CN201910944409 | 30.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910944409 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4047841 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4047841 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/27, H04B17/29 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
H04B17/27 (EP);
H04W4/022 (CN);
H04W4/023 (US);
G01S11/02 (US);
G08G1/0962 (US);
H04B17/29 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] |
Former [2022/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DES ERFASSUNGSBEREICHS EINES FAHRZEUGS, VORRICHTUNG UND MEDIUM | [2022/34] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING SENSING RANGE OF VEHICLE, APPARATUS AND MEDIUM | [2022/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE PLAGE DE DÉTECTION D'UN VÉHICULE, APPAREIL ET SUPPORT | [2022/34] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 22.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20165871.3 / EP3799332 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2024 | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | SE | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 24.01.2024 | |
BG | 24.01.2024 | ||
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017299689 (VA VUTHA [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0076]; figures 1A, 1B, 1C * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0115]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0138] *; | [A]KR101915363B (HYUNDAI AUTOEVER CORP [KR]) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0068] * |