EP4261894 - TRENCH-GATE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 19.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexperia B.V. Jonkerbosplein 52 6534 AB Nijmegen / NL | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siddiqui, Imran Manchester SK7 5BJ / GB | 02 /
Peake, Steven Manchester SK7 5BJ / GB | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Pjanovic, Ilija Nexperia B.V. Legal & IP Jonkerbosplein 52 6534 AB Nijmegen / NL | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 22168316.2 | 14.04.2022 | [2023/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4261894 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H01L21/336, H01L29/40 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H01L29/7813 (EP,US);
H01L29/7801 (CN);
H01L21/26513 (US);
H01L29/063 (CN);
H01L29/0684 (CN);
H01L29/1095 (US);
H01L29/401 (EP,US);
H01L29/407 (EP,US);
H01L29/41775 (CN);
H01L29/4236 (CN);
H01L29/42364 (CN);
H01L29/66674 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] |
Former [2023/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRABEN-GATTER-HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2023/42] | English: | TRENCH-GATE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2023/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR À GRILLE EN TRANCHÉE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/42] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | 16.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011136309 (GRIVNA GORDON M [US], et al) [Y] 10* paragraphs [0016] - [0042]; figures 1-20 *; | [XYI]US2013248992 (PADMANABHAN BALAJI [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0050]; figures 1-9 * [Y] 10 [I] 11 |