EP4083745 - ACTIVE COMPENSATION CIRCUIT FOR A SEMICONDUCTOR REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics International N.V. Chemin du Champ des Filles 39 1228 Plan-les-Ouates, Geneva / CH | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHASHWAT 201010 Kaushambi / IN | 02 /
NARWAL, Rajesh 201301 Greater Noida / IN | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 22168531.6 | 14.04.2022 | [2022/44] | Priority number, date | US202117242067 | 27.04.2021 Original published format: US202117242067 | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4083745 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4083745 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/565, G05F1/575 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
G05F1/575 (EP,US);
H02M3/156 (CN);
G05F1/59 (US);
G05F1/565 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] |
Former [2022/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AKTIVE KOMPENSATIONSSCHALTUNG FÜR EINEN HALBLEITERREGLER | [2022/44] | English: | ACTIVE COMPENSATION CIRCUIT FOR A SEMICONDUCTOR REGULATOR | [2022/44] | French: | CIRCUIT DE COMPENSATION ACTIVE POUR UN RÉGULATEUR À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2022/44] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 13.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO02054167 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,9-11,13,14 * page 1, lines 1-3; figures 1-6 * * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 23 * * page 7, line 12 - page 12, line 33 * * esp. Figs. 3-6 * [A] 4-6,8,12,15,16 [I] 7; | [A]US2006012356 (KASE KIYOSHI [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 1, paragraphs 1, 7; figures 1-4 * * page 1, paragraph 14 - page 4, paragraph 40 * * esp. par. [0019]; claim 5; Figs. 3, 4 *; | [A]US2012038332 (LIN YUNG-CHENG [TW]) [A] 1-16 * page 1, paragraph 3; figures 1-10 * * page 1, paragraph 11 - page 2, paragraph 14 * * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 5, paragraph 41 ** esp. par. [0033]; Figs. 4-10 *; | [XAI]US2013002216 (KIM SUNG-HA [KR]) [X] 1,2,9,10,13 * page 1, paragraph 3; figures 1-8 * * page 1, paragraph 6 - page 2, paragraph 28 * * page 3, paragraph 44 - page 6, paragraph 88 * * esp. pars. [0011], [0014], [0016], [0020], [0022], [0023], [0050], [0070]; Figs. 2-6 * [A] 3-6,8,11,12,14-16 [I] 7; | [XAI]US2021034087 (LIU QING [SG], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,13 * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-6 * * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 10 * * page 2, paragraph 18 - page 5, paragraph 39 * * esp. pars. [0001], [0008], [0025]-[0030]; claim 7; Figs. 2, 3A, 5 * [A] 3-6,8,11,12,14-16 [I] 7 |