EP4089222 - COMBINATION WASHING AND DRYING APPLIANCE HAVING AN AIRFLOW SYSTEM CONTAINED WITHIN AN OUTER TUB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 26.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 North M-63 MD 3601 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | [2023/11] |
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION 2000 North M-63 MD 3601 Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carnevale, Matteo 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | 02 /
Daniele, Massimiliano 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | 03 /
Vitaletti, Leonardo 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | 04 /
Vitali, Alberto 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A., Milano, Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/46] | Spina, Alessandro Whirlpool Management EMEA S.R.L. Via Carlo Pisacane, 1 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 22168696.7 | 18.04.2022 | [2022/46] | Priority number, date | US202117315622 | 10.05.2021 Original published format: US202117315622 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4089222 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D06F25/00, D06F58/24, D06F58/08, // D06F58/02, D06F58/20 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
D06F58/08 (EP);
D06F29/005 (US);
D06F25/00 (EP);
D06F37/304 (US);
D06F58/24 (EP);
D06F58/26 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] |
Former [2022/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE WASCH- UND TROCKENVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM IN EINER ÄUSSEREN WANNE ENTHALTENEN LUFTSTROMSYSTEM | [2022/46] | English: | COMBINATION WASHING AND DRYING APPLIANCE HAVING AN AIRFLOW SYSTEM CONTAINED WITHIN AN OUTER TUB | [2022/46] | French: | APPAREIL DE LAVAGE ET DE SÉCHAGE COMBINÉ DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME DE FLUX D'AIR CONTENUE DANS UNE CUVE EXTERNE | [2022/46] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 16.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2892335 (GRAY JR WALTER E); | [YA]US2940179 (CZECH CLIFFORD F); | [XYI]US3006176 (BEHRENS CURTIS E); | [A]US4338730 (TATSUMI HISAO, et al); | [A]US2009064533 (NAKIRI KAZUTOSHI [JP]); | [YA]EP3701076 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |