EP4265537 - PAPER TUBULAR BAG AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ulrich Etiketten Gesellschaft m.b.H. Marksteinergasse 2 1210 Wien / AT | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ulrich, Rainer 2100 Korneuburg / AT | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | KLIMENT & HENHAPEL Patentanwälte OG Gonzagagasse 15/2 1010 Wien / AT | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 22169291.6 | 21.04.2022 | [2023/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265537 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/02, B65D33/04, B31B70/00, B31B70/81, B31B70/83, B65D75/52, B65D75/54, B65D77/00, B65D85/34 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
B65D85/34 (EP);
B65D33/01 (EP,AT);
B31B70/008 (EP);
B31B70/16 (EP);
B31B70/262 (EP);
B31B70/62 (EP);
B31B70/64 (EP);
B65D33/02 (EP);
B65D33/04 (EP,AT);
B65D75/20 (EP);
B65D75/522 (EP);
B65D75/54 (EP);
B65D77/003 (EP);
B65D85/345 (EP);
B31B2150/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PAPIERSCHLAUCHBEUTEL UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2023/43] | English: | PAPER TUBULAR BAG AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME | [2023/43] | French: | SACHET TUBULAIRE EN PAPIER ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/43] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/39] | 22.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH249529 (MENG FRITZ [CH]) [A] 1* page 1, lines 1-65; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]DE29506855U (GOETZE NORD WEST VERPACKUNG [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, line 2 * * page 2, line 5 - page 4, line 3 * * page 5, line 3 - page 8, line 1 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2836130 (MESEGUER CRISTOBAL SA [ES]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [Y]FR2837474 (MESEGUER CRISTOBAL SA [ES]) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, lines 6-22,29-36 * * page 3, line 32 - page 5, line 27 * * page 4, line 36- - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, lines 19-22 * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]WO2018073462 (GIRNET INT S L [ES]) [A] 1 * page 7, paragraphs 4-5; figures 1-2 * |