EP4098905 - FLYWEIGHT DAMPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOLING, Aaron Rockford, IL, 61109 / US | 02 /
LEMMERS, Glenn C. Jr. Loves Park, 61111 / US | 03 /
LEHS, Joshua A Stillman Valley, 61084 / US | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 22169302.1 | 21.04.2022 | [2022/49] | Priority number, date | US202163180431P | 27.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163180431 P | US202117403283 | 16.08.2021 Original published format: US202117403283 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098905 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/12, F16F15/129 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
F16F15/1202 (EP);
F16F15/1292 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] |
Former [2022/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLIEHGEWICHTSDÄMPFER | [2022/49] | English: | FLYWEIGHT DAMPER | [2022/49] | French: | AMORTISSEUR A MASSELOTTE | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 05.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1967446 (MEYER ANDRE J) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB792904 (MICHAEL BOCHORY) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4752077 (HOFFELNER HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15* figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]DE8510138U (LUCK LAMMELLEN UND KUPPLUNGSBAU GMBH) [A] 1 * figures 6,7 *; | [A]US2007074885 (AEBERHARD BRUNO [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XAI]GB2461545 (ANTONOV AUTOMOTIVE EUROP [NL]) [X] 1-4,6,9-11,13-15 * figures 1,2 * [A] 5,7,8 [I] 12; | [A]US8851262 (ENGEL BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-2 * |