EP4070849 - ORAL MUSCLE TRAINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 24.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signifier Medical Technologies Limited 50 Woodgate Leicester LE3 5GF / GB | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMA, Anshul Nottingham, NG3 5EL / GB | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 22170049.5 | 12.10.2015 | [2022/41] | Priority number, date | GB20140021448 | 03.12.2014 Original published format: GB 201421448 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070849 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61N1/36, A61N1/372 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
A61N1/0548 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61N1/05 (RU);
A61N1/3601 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61N1/04 (GB);
A61N1/36 (GB,RU);
A61N1/36003 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] |
Former [2022/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MUNDMUSKELTRAINING | [2022/41] | English: | ORAL MUSCLE TRAINING | [2022/41] | French: | ENTRAÎNEMENT MUSCULAIRE ORAL | [2022/41] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 06.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15782067.1 / EP3226960 | EP19160899.1 / EP3517165 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6212435 (LATTNER STEFANIE [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract ** columns 5-17 *; | [A]US2007173893 (PITTS WALTER C [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0017] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0045] *; | [A]US2011112601 (MEADOWS PAUL M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2014135868 (BASHYAM JACOB BASHYAM [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0032] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0075] *; | [A]JP2014158607 (TERUMO CORP) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |