EP4269150 - ARTICULATED TRACKED VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colomban, Loic c/o Société Colomban SARL ZA De La Tour 05100 Villar-Saint-Pancrace / FR | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Odoom, Ernest Gsmart IP SA Route de Florissant 81 1206 Genève / CH | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 22170133.7 | 26.04.2022 | [2023/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4269150 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/16, B60K23/08, B60K1/00, B60K7/00 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
B62D55/0655 (EP);
B60K17/165 (EP);
B60K17/34 (EP);
B60K23/08 (EP);
B60K23/0808 (EP);
B60K7/0015 (EP);
B60K1/00 (EP);
B60K2001/001 (EP);
B60K7/0007 (EP);
B60Y2200/148 (EP);
B60Y2200/25 (EP);
B60Y2200/44 (EP);
B60Y2400/85 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWEITEILIGES KETTENFAHRZEUG | [2023/44] | English: | ARTICULATED TRACKED VEHICLE | [2023/44] | French: | VÉHICULE ARTICULÉ À CHENILLES | [2023/44] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0066677 (PRINOTH ERICH) [X] 13 * abstract * [A] 1-12,14; | [A]SU1391983 (KH POLT I IM V I LENINA [SU], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2012271521 (NORDBERG BJOERN [SE]) [A] 1-14* abstract * | by applicant | EP1405782 | EP2490916 | FR3049968 | WO2021137375 |