EP4194636 - A CORRUGATED CONSTRUCTION ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN PLACO Tour Saint-Gobain 12 place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DASH, Girish 400101 Mumbai / IN | 02 /
SHINDE, Shailendra 400024 Mumbai / IN | 03 /
AHMED, Rizwan 400070 Mumbai / IN | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche B.P. 135 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 22170347.3 | 10.04.2018 | [2023/24] | Priority number, date | IN201741018271 | 24.05.2017 Original published format: IN201741018271 | [2023/24] | Previously filed application, date | WO2018IN50205 | 10.04.2018 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4194636 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/36, E04C2/32, B31F1/07, B31F1/30 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
E04C2/322 (EP,US);
E04B2/7457 (EP,US);
E04B2/789 (EP,US);
E04C2/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] |
Former [2023/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GEWELLTES KONSTRUKTIONSELEMENT | [2023/24] | English: | A CORRUGATED CONSTRUCTION ELEMENT | [2023/24] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONSTRUCTION ONDULÉ | [2023/24] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 14.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18805541.2 / EP3631115 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]DE2128588 (SONSTRUCTIONS ELECTR DE LA SEI) [X] 1,5-10 * figure 2 * [A] 18-22 [Y] 3,11-14 [I] 2,4; | [A]US4170122 (COWELL TIMOTHY A T [GB]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2232427 (KH STRAMIT CORP LTD [AU]) [A] 1-22 * figure 5 *; | [XAYI]US2008110126 (HOWCHIN ROBERT [CA]) [X] 1-12,16-22 * paragraphs [0036] , [0037] , [0041] , [0044]; figures 2,10,11,13 * [A] 13 [Y] 3 [I] 14,15; | [A]DE202008010441U (KNAUF GIPS KG [DE]) [A] 1-22 * figure 5c *; | [XAI]FI8481U (AULIS LUNDELL OY [FI]) [X] 1-10,16,17 * the whole document * [A] 18-22 [I] 11-15; | [XAYI]EP2116658 (LUPATO GIAN SIRO [IT]) [X] 1,5-10,13,14,16,17 * paragraphs [0011] , [0019] , [0024] , [0025]; figures 2,5,6 * [A] 18-22 [Y] 3,11-14 [I] 2,4,15; | [A]WO2014207159 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]) [A] 1-22* the whole document * | by applicant | EP1124023 | US2009038255 | US2009126315 | WO2010EP08296 |