EP4091838 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken 651-0072 / JP | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIAO, Dong Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 651-0072 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Masumi Kobe-shi, Hyogo, 651-0072 / JP | 03 /
MIKI, Takashi Kobe-shi, 651-0072 / JP | 04 /
MISAKI, Momoka Kobe-shi, 651-0072 / JP | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 22170357.2 | 27.04.2022 | [2022/47] | Priority number, date | JP20210084142 | 18.05.2021 Original published format: JP 2021084142 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091838 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/22, B60C9/20 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
B60C9/2204 (EP);
B60C9/2009 (EP);
B60C2009/2077 (EP);
B60C2009/2083 (EP);
B60C2009/2257 (EP);
B60C2009/2261 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFEN | [2022/47] | English: | TIRE | [2022/47] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 24.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2016203687 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [X]US2018022157 (LARDJANE AURORE [FR], et al); | [X]US2018022160 (ASTAIX CAMILLE [FR], et al); | [XI]US9919563 (LARDJANE AURORE [FR], et al) | by applicant | JP2019177838 |