EP4123643 - ENHANCEMENT OF SPATIAL AUDIO SIGNALS BY MODULATED DECORRELATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2023/10] |
Former [2023/04] | For all designated states DOLBY LABORATORIES LICENSING CORPORATION 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCGRATH, David S. McMahons Point, NSW 2060 / AU | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [2024/25] |
Former [2023/04] | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 22170424.0 | 02.03.2016 | [2023/04] | Priority number, date | US201562127613P | 03.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562127613 P | US201662298905P | 23.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662298905 P | [2023/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4123643 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4123643 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/008 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
G10L19/008 (EP,CN,US);
H04S3/008 (CN,US);
H04S2400/11 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] |
Former [2023/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG VON RÄUMLICHEN AUDIOSIGNALEN DURCH MODULIERTE DEKORRELATION | [2023/04] | English: | ENHANCEMENT OF SPATIAL AUDIO SIGNALS BY MODULATED DECORRELATION | [2023/04] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DE SIGNAUX AUDIO SPATIAUX PAR DÉCORRÉLATION MODULÉE | [2023/04] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 19.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16718934.9 / EP3266021 | EP19172220.6 / EP3611727 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009240503 (MIYASAKA SHUJI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011090834 (DOLBY LAB LICENSING CORP [US], et al); | [A]EP2830333 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) | by applicant | EP20190172220 |