EP4269531 - MULTIFUNCTIONAL WAX DISPERSANT FOR SUBTERRANEAN CHEMICAL APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change - French title | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Liang 77382 The Woodlands / US | 02 /
SIRAK, Sofia 19462 Plymouth Meeting / US | 03 /
ZHUK, Iryna 18976 Warrington / US | 04 /
MEISTER, Claudia 64285 Darmstadt / DE | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 22170499.2 | 28.04.2022 | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4269531 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/524 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
C09K8/524 (EP,BR);
C09K8/584 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2023/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIFUNKTIONELLES WACHSDISPERGIERMITTEL FÜR UNTERIRDISCHE CHEMISCHE ANWENDUNGEN | [2023/44] | English: | MULTIFUNCTIONAL WAX DISPERSANT FOR SUBTERRANEAN CHEMICAL APPLICATIONS | [2023/44] | French: | DISPERSANT DE CIRE MULTIFONCTIONNEL POUR APPLICATIONS CHIMIQUES SOUTERRAINES | [2024/28] |
Former [2023/44] | DISPERSANT DE CIRE MULTIFONCTIONS POUR APPLICATIONS CHIMIQUES SOUTERRAINES | Examination procedure | 28.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 28.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018023040 (SCHILLING MARTIN [DE], et al); | [A]WO2020264073 (LOCUS OIL IP COMPANY LLC [US]); | [A]US2021301191 (FARMER SEAN [US], et al) | by applicant | DE2939519 | JPS60183032 | EP0282942 | JPH01304034 | EP0499434 | DE4127908 | FR2740779 | DE19600743 | DE19648439 | CN1337439 | WO03002700 | WO03006146 | KR20040033376 | EP1445302 | FR2855752 | JP2006070231 | JP2006083238 | JP2006274233 | JP2007181789 | JP2008062179 | EP1411111 | US7556654 | US7985722 | US8372786 | EP2786743 | EP2787065 | CN104650824 | US2017298710 | WO2019154970 | US2020071600 |