EP4268760 - MULTI-USE DISPENSER AND APPLICATION SET WITH SUCH A MULTI-USE DISPENSER AND AT LEAST ONE APPLICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states medmix Switzerland AG Rütistrasse 7 9469 Haag (Rheintal) / CH | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Frank Feldkirch / AT | 02 /
MOSER, Josef Unterkulm / CH | 03 /
NAGARAJA, Dilip Kumar Karnataka / IN | 04 /
ABUNDIS DE HILBE, Vanessa Triesenberg / LI | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 22170572.6 | 28.04.2022 | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4268760 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/62, A46B11/00, A61C9/00, B01F33/501, B05C17/005, B05C17/01, A61M5/315 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
A61C9/0026 (EP);
A46B11/0034 (EP);
A46B11/0055 (EP);
A46B11/0065 (EP);
A61C5/62 (EP);
B05C17/012 (EP);
A46B2200/1066 (EP);
A61M2005/2407 (EP);
A61M2005/2488 (EP);
A61M2039/1033 (EP);
A61M5/14546 (EP);
A61M5/14566 (EP);
A61M5/2422 (EP);
A61M5/31578 (EP);
A61M5/31595 (EP);
B05C17/00593 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRWEG-SPENDER UND ANWENDUNGSSET MIT EINEM SOLCHEN MEHRZWECKSPENDER UND MINDESTENS EINEM APPLIKATOR | [2023/44] | English: | MULTI-USE DISPENSER AND APPLICATION SET WITH SUCH A MULTI-USE DISPENSER AND AT LEAST ONE APPLICATOR | [2023/44] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR À USAGES MULTIPLES ET ENSEMBLE D'APPLICATION DOTÉ D'UN TEL DISTRIBUTEUR À USAGES MULTIPLES ET D'AU MOINS UN APPLICATEUR | [2023/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/40] | 27.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4710178 (HENRI LEONARD [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,13,14 * figure 2; claim 1 * [Y] 3,4 [I] 15; | [X]US5873499 (LESCHINSKY MIKHAIL [US], et al) [X] 1,6,8,10,11,13,14 * column 4, lines 22-27; figures 1,3 *; | [X]US6283660 (FURLONG PATRICK J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,11,12,15 * column 3, line 401 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-3 *; | [XYI]US6296484 (NIHEI TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * figures 1-4; claim 1 * [Y] 3,4 [I] 11; | [Y]US2010167231 (DUBBE JOHN W [DE], et al) [Y] 3,4* paragraph [0074]; figures 7-8 *; | [XI]EP2468417 (COX LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0017] , [0024]; figures 1-5; claims 1,15 * [I] 11; | [X]WO2018151737 (NEOGEN CORP [US]) [X] 1,6-9,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0027] - [0028] - [0038]; figures 1-4,6A,6B,8 * |