EP4082376 - HINGEPLATE MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bell Sports, Inc. 5550 Scotts Valley Drive Scotts Valley, CA 95066-3438 / US | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITESELL, Scott S. Camarillo, California, 93010 / US | 02 /
BROERS, Lawrence Aptos, California, 95003 / US | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Reed Smith LLP 112, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 22171029.6 | 29.04.2022 | [2022/44] | Priority number, date | US202117243719 | 29.04.2021 Original published format: US202117243719 | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4082376 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/22 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
A42B3/222 (EP,US);
A42B3/0406 (CN);
A42B3/20 (CN);
A42B3/223 (US);
A42B3/24 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] |
Former [2022/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHARNIERPLATTENMECHANISMUS | [2022/44] | English: | HINGEPLATE MECHANISM | [2022/44] | French: | MÉCANISME DE PAUMELLE | [2022/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 02.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1166666 (KASCO BETA S P A [IT]); | [A]EP1293139 (OPTICOS SRL [IT]); | [XAI]EP1856999 (SHOEI CO LTD [JP]) |