EP4234158 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING WELD QUALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMMAREDDY, Vamshi 560066 Bengaluru / IN | 02 /
KARNATI, Sreekar Niskayuna, 12309 / US | 03 /
GORAVAR, Shivappa 560066 Bengaluru / IN | 04 /
GALLIERS, Brian Cincinnati, 45215 / US | 05 /
THYSSEN, Jeffrey Vermont, 05759 / US | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 22171042.9 | 29.04.2022 | [2023/35] | Priority number, date | IN202211010223 | 25.02.2022 Original published format: IN202211010223 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4234158 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23K31/12, B23K31/00 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
B23K31/125 (EP,US);
G06T7/0006 (CN);
G06T7/0004 (US);
B23K31/006 (EP);
G06T7/0008 (CN);
G06T7/62 (CN);
G06V10/764 (CN,US);
G06T2207/10028 (CN);
G06T2207/20081 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE DER SCHWEISSQUALITÄT | [2023/35] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ANALYZING WELD QUALITY | [2023/35] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DE LA QUALITÉ D'UNE SOUDURE | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/14] | 23.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3900870 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8,12,13 * figure * * paragraphs [0027] , [0031] - [0034] - [0043] - [0049] * * claims 1-9 *[I] 9-11,14,15; | [XI]US2022011240 (SCHWARZ JOACHIM [CH]) [X] 1-3,5-7,12,13 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0020] - [0036] - [0046] - [0081] , [0088] , [0103] - [0108] * [I] 4,8-11,14,15; | [XI] - STADTER CHRISTIAN ET AL, "Real-time prediction of quality characteristics in laser beam welding using optical coherence tomography and machine learning", JOURNAL OF LASER APPLICATIONS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, 2 HUNTINGTON QUADRANGLE, MELVILLE, NY 11747, vol. 32, no. 2, doi:10.2351/7.0000077, ISSN 1042-346X, (20200505), (20200505), XP012247434 [X] 1-10,12,13 * abstract * * page 4 - page 7 * [I] 11,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2351/7.0000077 | [XI] - HARTL R ET AL, "Automated visual inspection of friction stir welds: a deep learning approach", SPIE PROCEEDINGS; [PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE ISSN 0277-786X], SPIE, US, (20190621), vol. 11059, doi:10.1117/12.2525947, ISBN 978-1-5106-3673-6, pages 1105909 - 1105909, XP060122892 [X] 1-6,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 7-11,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2525947 |