EP4071994 - POWER DISTRIBUTION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Energy Power Conversion Technology Ltd Thomson Houston Way Off Technology Drive Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 1BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/50] | For all designated states GE Energy Power Conversion Technology Ltd Thomson Houston Way Off Technology Drive RUGBY Warwickshire CV21 1BD / GB | ||
Former [2022/41] | For all designated states GE Energy Power Conversion Technology Ltd. Boughton Road, Rugby Warwickshire CV21 1BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clarke, Nicholas James Barrow upon Soar, LE12 8GS / GB | 02 /
Childs, Jonathon Nuneaton, CV10 0DT / GB | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 22171784.6 | 06.07.2012 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4071994 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/458, H02J3/38, H02J3/46, H02P9/04, B63H21/17 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
H02M5/458 (EP,US);
B63H23/24 (BR,US);
H02J3/40 (US);
H02J3/466 (EP,BR,US);
H02P9/04 (EP,BR,US);
B63H21/17 (EP);
H02J2310/42 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] |
Former [2022/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STROMVERTEILUNGSSYSTEME | [2022/41] | English: | POWER DISTRIBUTION SYSTEMS | [2022/41] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE DISTRIBUTION DE PUISSANCE | [2022/41] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 11.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12175427.9 / EP2682339 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5006781 (SCHULTZ MARK H [US], et al) [Y] 6-8 * column 7, lines 18-28; figures 1,2,10,14A,16,17 * * column 4, lines 64-68 * * column 15, lines 49-65 *; | [Y]US2005140142 (WELCHES RICHARD S [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,7-12 * paragraphs [0043] , [0051] , [0069] , [0072] , [0078] , [0080] , [0082] , [0092] , [0096]; figure 8b *; | [Y]WO2007052349 (SHIKOKU RESEARCH INST INC [JP], et al) [Y] 6-8* paragraphs [0197] , [0204]; figures 2-5 *; | [XY]WO2011092330 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,13,14 * abstract * [Y] 4-12; | US2012302112 [ ] (HARTIG RAINER [DE], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0020] , [0034] , [0043] , [0044] , [0046] , [0048] , [0049] , [0056] , [0059] , [0068]; figures 1-5 * |