EP4106348 - HEARING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sivantos Pte. Ltd. 18 Tai Seng Street No. 08-08 18 Tai Seng Singapore 539775 / SG | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAN, Hoong Yih 540249 Singapore / SG | 02 /
AGUSTIAR, Agustiar 470762 Singapur / SG | 03 /
LIM, Soon Hon 81000 Kulaijaya. Johor Darul Ehsan / MY | 04 /
CHIA, Shinq Yee 756985 Singapur / SG | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 22171850.5 | 05.05.2022 | [2022/51] | Priority number, date | DE202110206011 | 14.06.2021 Original published format: DE102021206011 | [2022/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4106348 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, H04R1/28 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
H04R25/456 (EP);
H04R1/42 (US);
H04R1/025 (US);
H04R25/604 (EP,US);
H04R1/288 (EP);
H04R2225/021 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] |
Former [2022/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÖRVORRICHTUNG | [2022/51] | English: | HEARING DEVICE | [2022/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUDITIF | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 20.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008112584 (KARAMUK ERDAL [CH]); | [XY]US2014153755 (HUG ROLAND [CH], et al); | [XY]US2016277852 (LEE CHUAN FOONG [MY], et al); | [XY]DE102018221807 (KNOWLES ELECTRONICS LLC [US]) |