EP4086970 - DISPLAY PANEL AND DISPLAY APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hyunjung 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
JIN, Guanghai 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Choi, Yunmi 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 22171959.4 | 06.05.2022 | [2022/45] | Priority number, date | KR20210059506 | 07.05.2021 Original published format: KR 20210059506 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4086970 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L25/075 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H10K59/131 (EP,KR,US);
H01L25/167 (EP,US);
H01L24/05 (US);
H01L24/08 (US);
H01L27/124 (KR);
H01L27/156 (KR);
H10K59/123 (KR);
H01L2224/0557 (US);
H01L2224/05573 (US);
H01L2224/05624 (US);
H01L2224/05647 (US);
H01L2224/05666 (US);
H01L2224/0568 (US);
H01L2224/08146 (US);
H01L2224/08148 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGETAFEL UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2022/45] | English: | DISPLAY PANEL AND DISPLAY APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME | [2022/45] | French: | ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE LE COMPRENANT | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 28.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003168969 (TANABE TAKAHISA [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] , [0021] - [0028]; figure 3 *; | [XI]US2012025700 (RYU DO-HYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * paragraphs [0057] - [0073] - [0078] - [0079] - [0083] - [0085] - [0091] - [0103] - [0139]; figures 1,2,6,16A * [I] 5,6; | [A]US2017103926 (AOYAGI AKIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0052] - [0068]; figure 7 *; | [X]US2017243860 (HONG JONGHO [KR], et al) [X] 8 * paragraphs [0040] - [0062]; figures 1-3 * |