EP4273804 - DETERMINATION OF SPATIAL ALIGNMENT OF AN OBJECT BY ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brillux GmbH & Co. KG Weseler Strasse 401 48163 Münster / DE | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stempel, Dr. Sascha 91054 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Hülsdünker, Arno 48151 Münster / DE | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 22172103.8 | 06.05.2022 | [2023/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273804 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/73 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
G06T7/74 (EP);
G06T2207/10016 (EP);
G06T2207/20081 (EP);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2207/30164 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG EINER RÄUMLICHEN AUSRICHTUNG EINES GEGENSTANDS MITTELS KÜNSTLICHER INTELLIGENZ | [2023/45] | English: | DETERMINATION OF SPATIAL ALIGNMENT OF AN OBJECT BY ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE | [2023/45] | French: | DÉTERMINATION D'UNE ORIENTATION SPATIALE D'UN OBJET AU MOYEN DE L'INTELLIGENCE ARTIFICIELLE | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/41] | 03.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - CORONA ENRIC ET AL, "Pose Estimation for Objects with Rotational Symmetry", 2018 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS (IROS), IEEE, (20181001), doi:10.1109/IROS.2018.8594282, pages 7215 - 7222, XP033491553 [X] 1-5,8-15 * abstract * * Abschnitt "III. Our Approach" * [I] 6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.2018.8594282 | [XI] - LEE JOO-HAENG ET AL, "Synthetic learning set for object pose estimation: Initial experiments", 2017 14TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON UBIQUITOUS ROBOTS AND AMBIENT INTELLIGENCE (URAI), IEEE, (20170628), doi:10.1109/URAI.2017.7992897, pages 106 - 108, XP033128959 [X] 1-5,8-15 * abstract * * Abschnitte "1. Introduction", "2.1. Target task and applications", "2.2. Modeling and scene setup", "2.3. Rendering" * [I] 6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/URAI.2017.7992897 |