EP4102620 - ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK On Co., Ltd. 26, Jong-ro Jongno-gu Seoul 03188 / KR | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEOK, Jong Ho 34124 Daejeon / KR | 02 /
KIM, Suk Chul 34124 Daejeon / KR | 03 /
KIM, Yong Uk 34124 Daejeon / KR | 04 /
KIM, Yun Hee 34124 Daejeon / KR | 05 /
PARK, Byung Jun 34124 Daejeon / KR | 06 /
CHANG, Tae Hyun 34124 Daejeon / KR | 07 /
HAN, Dong Hwa 34124 Daejeon / KR | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 22172157.4 | 06.05.2022 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | KR20210068475 | 27.05.2021 Original published format: KR 20210068475 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4102620 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/647, H01M50/204, H01M50/209, H01M50/271, H01M50/273 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
H01M50/204 (EP);
H01M50/251 (CN,KR);
H01M50/244 (CN);
H01M50/24 (CN,KR,US);
A62C3/16 (CN,US);
A62C37/40 (US);
H01M10/647 (EP);
H01M50/143 (US);
H01M50/209 (EP);
H01M50/271 (EP);
H01M50/273 (EP);
H01M2220/10 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] |
Former [2022/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIESPEICHERSYSTEM | [2022/50] | English: | ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM | [2022/50] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 14.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3182482 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035]; figures 2a,2b,3,4a,4b,5 *; | [XA]US2021074982 (KIM JIN TAEK [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,6 * figures 6,13,14A,14B,15,16 * [A] 3-5,7-15; | [XA]EP3792998 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0060] - [0073]; figures 5a,9-12 *[A] 3-15; | [XA]EP3800727 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraphs [0060] - [0066]; figures 66,14A,14B,15,16 * [A] 3-5,7-15 |