EP4057563 - CANCELLATION POLICY FOR RADIO RESOURCE CONTROL CONFIGURED UPLINK TRANSMISSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Jing San Diego / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia San Diego / US | 03 /
LUO, Tao San Diego / US | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 22172180.6 | 26.03.2019 | [2022/37] | Priority number, date | US201862653200P | 05.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862653200 P | US201916363730 | 25.03.2019 Original published format: US201916363730 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4057563 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4057563 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04W72/0446 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/30 (US);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W72/1268 (CN);
H04W72/21 (CN);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04L5/0096 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/37] | H04L5/00, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] |
Former [2022/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANNULLIERUNGSSTRATEGIE FÜR KONFIGURIERTE UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNGEN EINER FUNKRESSOURCENSTEUERUNG | [2022/37] | English: | CANCELLATION POLICY FOR RADIO RESOURCE CONTROL CONFIGURED UPLINK TRANSMISSIONS | [2022/37] | French: | POLITIQUE D'ANNULATION POUR DES TRANSMISSIONS EN LIAISON MONTANTE DE GESTION DES RESSOURCES RADIO | [2022/37] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 14.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19717645.6 / EP3776979 | Divisional application(s) | EP22215470.0 / EP4170958 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2023 | CZ | 13.12.2023 | EE | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | IT | 13.12.2023 | LT | 13.12.2023 | LV | 13.12.2023 | NL | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SE | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | BG | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | PT | 15.04.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 13.12.2023 | |
CZ | 13.12.2023 | ||
EE | 13.12.2023 | ||
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
LT | 13.12.2023 | ||
LV | 13.12.2023 | ||
NL | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SE | 13.12.2023 | ||
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 13.12.2023 | |
BG | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Correction on Procedures for UL Transmissions", vol. RAN WG1, no. Vancouver, Canada; 20180122 - 20180126, (20180112), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1800455 CORRECTION ON PROCEDURES FOR UL TRANSMISSIONS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; F, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5FAH/NR%5FAH%5F1801/Docs/, (20180112), XP051384339 [A] 1-15 * section 1; page 2 * * section 5; page 3 - page 4 * | [A] - VIVO, "Remaining issues on UL data transmission procedure", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180215), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1801542_REMAINING ISSUES ON UL DATA TRANSMISSION PROCEDURE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F92/Docs/, (20180215), XP051396794 [A] 1-15 * section 2.4, 3 * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Corrections on UE-Group Common PDCCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20180226 - 20180302, (20180217), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1801975 GC-PDCCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F92/Docs/, (20180217), XP051397779 [A] 1-15 * section 2; page 1 - page 2 * | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Discussion on group common PDCCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Vancouver, Canada; 20180122 - 20180126, (20180113), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1800373, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5FAH/NR%5FAH%5F1801/Docs/, (20180113), XP051384828 [A] 1-15 * section 2.1.1; page 5 * * section 2.1.2; page 5 - page 6 * * section 2.1.4; page 7 - page 8 * |