EP4099082 - OPTICAL SCANNING DEVICE, DRIVING METHOD OF OPTICAL SCANNING DEVICE, AND IMAGE DRAWING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIZAWA, Hirotoshi Kanagawa, Tokyo, 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
SONODA, Shinichiro Kanagawa, Tokyo, 258-8577 / JP | 03 /
HISHINUMA, Yoshikazu Kanagawa, Tokyo, 258-8577 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Nobuya Kanagawa, Tokyo, 258-8577 / JP | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 22172413.1 | 09.05.2022 | [2022/49] | Priority number, date | JP20210092418 | 01.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021092418 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4099082 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/08, G02B26/10, B81B7/00, G01L1/16, G01L1/18 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
G02B26/101 (EP);
G02B26/105 (CN);
G02B26/0858 (EP,US);
G01B7/30 (US);
G01L1/16 (EP);
G02B26/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] |
Former [2022/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE ABTASTVORRICHTUNG, ANSTEUERVERFAHREN FÜR EINE OPTISCHE ABTASTVORRICHTUNG UND BILDZEICHNUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/49] | English: | OPTICAL SCANNING DEVICE, DRIVING METHOD OF OPTICAL SCANNING DEVICE, AND IMAGE DRAWING SYSTEM | [2022/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BALAYAGE OPTIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE BALAYAGE OPTIQUE ET SYSTÈME DE DESSIN D'IMAGE | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 05.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2016156913 (NIPPON SIGNAL CO LTD:THE) [A] 2-6,8-12,16,17 * paragraphs [0017] - [0021] - [ 0039] - [0042]; figures 2, 3, 4, 5 *; | [XI]WO2019163754 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [X] 1,7,13-15,18,19 * paragraphs [0016] - [0079]; figures 1, 2, 4, 6A, 6B * [I] 2-6,8-12,16,17; | [A]JP6833127B (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [A] 4-6,10-12* paragraph [0057] *; | [XI] - SEO YEONG-HYEON ET AL, "Scanning MEMS Mirror for High Definition and High Frame Rate Lissajous Patterns", MICROMACHINES, (20190118), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.3390/mi10010067, page 67, XP055846676 [X] 1,7,13-15,18,19 * abstract; section "1. Introduction";; figures 1, 2, 3, 4 * [I] 2-6,8-12,16,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/mi10010067 | by applicant | JP2016184018 | JP2018101040 |