EP4059457 - PERCUTANEOUS ACCESS PATHWAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Critical Innovations, LLC 4228 Marine Ave Lawndale, CA 90260 / US | [2022/47] |
Former [2022/38] | For all designated states Critical Innovations, LLC 392 East Beach Avenue Inglewood, CA 90302 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONALDSON, Ross Inglewood, 90302 / US | 02 /
BUCHANAN, Oliver Inglewood, 90302 / US | 03 /
ARMSTRONG, Jon Inglewood, 90302 / US | 04 /
CAMBRIDGE, John Inglewood, 90302 / US | 05 /
FISHER, Tim Inglewood, 90302 / US | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 22172503.9 | 21.09.2018 | [2022/38] | Priority number, date | US201762562183P | 22.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762562183 P | US201816113707 | 27.08.2018 Original published format: US201816113707 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059457 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61M1/04, A61B90/40, A61M39/02, // A61B17/00 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
A61M39/0247 (EP,US);
A61B17/34 (EP,US);
A61B17/3415 (EP,US);
A61B17/3423 (US);
A61B17/3498 (EP,US);
A61B90/40 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00809 (EP,US);
A61B2017/345 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3492 (EP,US);
A61M1/02 (US);
A61M2039/0252 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0258 (US);
A61M2039/0261 (US);
A61M2039/027 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0276 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0279 (EP,US);
A61M2039/0288 (EP,US);
A61M2210/101 (EP,US);
A61M27/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] |
Former [2022/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR PERKUTANEN ZUGANGSWEG | [2022/38] | English: | PERCUTANEOUS ACCESS PATHWAY SYSTEM | [2022/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE VOIE D'ACCÈS PERCUTANÉ | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 17.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18195962.8 / EP3459476 | EP20200268.9 / EP3782563 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6517519 (ROSEN RON S [US], et al); | [A]WO03071926 (PERSIDSKY MAXIM D [US], et al); | [A]US2008312638 (MCNEIL IAIN D [GB]); | [A]US2009227987 (SINGER HOWARD [US]); | [XI]US2015182733 (DONALDSON ROSS I [US]); | [A]US2016008081 (FORSELL PETER [CH]) | by applicant | US3777757 | US3789852 | US3894540 | US4221215 | US4392853 | US4767411 | US4767409 | US5183464 | US5215531 | US5215522 | US5242398 | US5263939 | US5336193 | US5429608 | US5431676 | US5489290 | US5490843 | US5545179 | US5562677 | US5662616 | US5776110 | US5807341 | US5830191 | US5897531 | US6162236 | US6325812 | US6517519 | US6605063 | US6638253 | US2003216770 | US2004049222 | US2004078026 | US2004199121 | US6905484 | US2005203565 | US2006025723 | US2006041270 | US2006212062 | US7135010 | US2007021768 | US2007038180 | US7244245 | US2008103451 | US2008125750 | US2009030375 | US2009205646 | US2009205651 | US2009209913 | US2009318898 | US2010170507 | US7776003 | US7789873 | US2010249694 | US7811293 | US7824366 | CN1756513B | US7842058 | US7892170 | US7896897 | US2011152874 | US2011201883 | US8062315 | US8092481 | US8128648 | US2012191044 | US8257251 | US8403913 | US8430094 | US2013131645 | US8518053 | US8795326 | US9616203 | US10046147 |