EP4275504 - CLIPPING MACHINE HAVING PIVOTABLE COVER WITH SUBSECTION DAMPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poly-clip System GmbH & Co. KG Niedeckerstraße 1 65795 Hattersheim / DE | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALDSTÄDT, Manfred 55124 Mainz / DE | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22172968.4 | 12.05.2022 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4275504 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A22C11/12, E05F5/10 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
A22C11/125 (EP);
E05F1/1091 (EP);
E05F5/10 (EP);
E05Y2800/24 (EP);
E05Y2999/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEMASCHINE MIT SCHWENKBARER ABDECKUNG MIT VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERABSCHNITTSDÄMPFUNG | [2023/46] | English: | CLIPPING MACHINE HAVING PIVOTABLE COVER WITH SUBSECTION DAMPING DEVICE | [2023/46] | French: | CLIPPEUSE À COUVERCLE PIVOTANT AVEC DISPOSITIF D'AMORTISSEMENT DE SOUS-SECTION | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 15.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE202006019883U (POLY CLIP SYSTEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0173] *; | [Y]WO2009021799 (HETTICH ONI GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1,8,11 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - page 12, line 16 *; | [A]US9986744 (EBERT DETLEF [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** column 1, line 13 - column 12, line 21 *; | [Y]US2020329721 (WEIDENHAUS BJÖRN [DE]) [Y] 1,8,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0078] *; | [A]US2021148147 (CAPUR ERTAC [TR], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0054] * |