EP4276362 - COOKING APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTROLUX APPLIANCES AKTIEBOLAG S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUKAMM, Alwin 91541 Rothenburg ob der Tauber / DE | 02 /
LEIKAM, Juergen 91541 Rothenburg ob der Tauber / DE | 03 /
WALTHER, Christoph 91541 Rothenburg ob der Tauber / DE | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22173058.3 | 12.05.2022 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4276362 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/10, A47J43/046 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
F24C15/10 (EP);
A47J43/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOCHGERÄT | [2023/46] | English: | COOKING APPLIANCE | [2023/46] | French: | APPAREIL DE CUISSON | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/46] | 05.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2023/46] | 03.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 15.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 29.07.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 29.07.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE20022823U (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1* figure 1 *; | [XI]US2008264927 (PENG ZHENG [US]) [X] 1-5,13,15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0026] - [0032] * [I] 6-8,10-12; | [XI]US2014203010 (ALET VIDAL JOSEP [ES], et al) [X] 1-5,13,15 * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0036] - [0044] * [I] 6-8,10-12; | [XI]US2014312026 (TRENCH ROCA LLUÍS [ES], et al) [X] 1-5,13-15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0021] - [0025] * [I] 6-8,10-12; | [XI]US2015182070 (LEIJENAAR SYBREN YME [NL], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * figures 1-8 * * paragraphs [0046] - [0056] * [I] 6-8,10-12; | [X]JP2015223317 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [X] 1-5 * figures 1, 2 *; | [XI]DE102017101168 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [X] 1-5,9 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0031] , [0039] * [I] 6-8,10-12,15; | [XI]DE102020110966 (SCHOTT AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,9 * figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0054] - [0070] * [I] 6-8,10-12 |