EP4101283 - RESIDUE SPREAD MAPPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGCO International GmbH Victor von Bruns-Strasse 17 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTIANSEN, Martin Peter 8930 Randers / DK | 02 /
TARRAGONA, Ramon Buchaca 8930 Randers / DK | 03 /
LAURSEN, Morten Stigaard 8930 Randers / DK | 04 /
MUJKIC, Esma 8930 Randers / DK | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | AGCO Intellectual Property Department AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 22173140.9 | 13.05.2022 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | GB20210008228 | 09.06.2021 Original published format: GB 202108228 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4101283 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/12, A01D41/127 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
A01D41/127 (EP);
G01C21/3807 (US);
A01D41/1243 (EP);
A01D75/00 (US);
G01C21/3841 (US);
A01B79/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] |
Former [2022/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RÜCKSTANDSTREUUNGSABBILDUNG | [2022/50] | English: | RESIDUE SPREAD MAPPING | [2022/50] | French: | CARTOGRAPHIE D'ÉTALEMENT DE RÉSIDUS | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 14.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP2382853 (CNH BELGIUM NV [BE]) [Y] 3,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0031] - [0033] - [0039] - [0042] * [A] 1,12,14,15; | [YA]US2018310474 (POSSELIUS JOHN HENRY [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0040] * [A] 1,12-15; | [XY]WO2019079205 (PREC PLANTING LLC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10-15 * abstract * * page 16, lines 26-29 * * claims 18,23-26 * [Y] 3,5,6,9; | [AP]EP3932172 (AGCO CORP [US]) [AP] 1,12-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0017] - [0030] * |