EP4276763 - IMAGE GENERATION FOR TESTING AN ELECTRONIC VEHICLE GUIDANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Comfort and Driving Assistance 6 rue Daniel Costantini 94000 Créteil / FR | [2024/01] |
Former [2023/46] | For all designated states Valeo Comfort and Driving Assistance 6 Rue Daniel Costantini 94000 Créteil / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HURYCH, David 10800 Prague / CZ | 02 /
VU, Tuan Hung 94000 Creteil / FR | 03 /
PEREZ, Patrick 94000 Creteil / FR | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Jauregui Urbahn, Kristian Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH CDA-IP Laiernstraße 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22173257.1 | 13.05.2022 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4276763 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/50, G06T19/20, G06T11/00 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
G06T15/506 (EP);
G06T11/00 (EP);
G06T15/503 (EP);
G06T19/20 (EP);
G06T7/50 (EP);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2219/2012 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNG ZUR PRÜFUNG EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN FAHRZEUGFÜHRUNGSSYSTEMS | [2023/46] | English: | IMAGE GENERATION FOR TESTING AN ELECTRONIC VEHICLE GUIDANCE SYSTEM | [2023/46] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'IMAGE POUR TESTER D'UN SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE DE VÉHICULE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 14.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2021012560 (ZHOU GUANGYU [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0052] , [0053] *; | [A]WO2021262243 (GOOGLE LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0048] , [0049] *; | [A] - YANG ZHENPEI ET AL, "SurfelGAN: Synthesizing Realistic Sensor Data for Autonomous Driving", 2020 IEEE/CVF CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR), IEEE, (20200613), doi:10.1109/CVPR42600.2020.01113, pages 11115 - 11124, XP033805429 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR42600.2020.01113 | [A] - LOSCOS C ET AL, "INTERACTIVE VIRTUAL RELIGHTING OF REAL SCENES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VISUALIZATION AND COMPUTER GRAPHICS, IEEE, USA, (200010), vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1109/2945.895874, ISSN 1077-2626, pages 289 - 305, XP000976847 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2945.895874 | [A] - HA Y-H ET AL, "A Method for Generating Simulated Nighttime Road Images Under Automotive Headlamp Lights", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE, USA, (200405), vol. 53, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TVT.2004.825790, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 695 - 704, XP011113236 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVT.2004.825790 | by applicant | - C. GODARD et al., "Digging Into Self-Supervised Monocular Depth Estimation", Proceedings of the IEEE/CVF International Conference on Computer Vision, (20190000), pages 3828 - 3838 | - J. ZHU et al., "Unpaired Image-to-image Translation Using Cycle-Consistent Adversarial Networks", IEEE International Conference on Computer Vision, (20170000), doi:10.1109/ICCV.2017.244, pages 2242 - 2251, XP055901486 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2017.244 | - F. BERNARDINI et al., "The Ball-Pivoting Algorithm for Surface Reconstruction", IEEE Transactions on Visualization and Computer Graphics, (19990000), vol. 5, pages 349 - 359 |