EP4091922 - MOBILE WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydac Mobilhydraulik GmbH Industriestrasse 66280 Sulzbach/Saar / DE | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiefer, Timo 66740 Saarlouis / DE | 02 /
Kihm, Benjamin 54340 Ensch / DE | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 22173566.5 | 16.05.2022 | [2022/47] | Priority number, date | DE20211002610 | 18.05.2021 Original published format: DE102021002610 | [2022/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4091922 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62D49/06, F15B11/028 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
B62D49/065 (EP);
F15B11/10 (EP);
F15B2211/30515 (EP);
F15B2211/327 (EP);
F15B2211/365 (EP);
F15B2211/50554 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRBARE ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2022/47] | English: | MOBILE WORKING MACHINE | [2022/47] | French: | MACHINE DE TRAVAIL MOBILE | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 23.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5704200 (CHMIELEWSKI JR THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1b, 2a *; | [A]US2009082930 (PETERS OLE [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP2591657 (HORSCH LEEB APPLIC SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure - *; | [A]US2014196996 (ITO TATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 2, 4-7 *; | [X]EP3259974 (MACDON IND LTD [CA]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [[0053] ] - [ [0058]] *; | [X]EP3530962 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [[0019] ] - [ [0023]] * | by applicant | WO2015067804 |