EP4068067 - MUSIC NOW PLAYING USER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 27.06.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARRIGAN, Taylor G. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 02 /
HOWARD, Joe Cupertino, 95014 / US | 03 /
McGLINN, Joshua Mooresville, 28117 / US | 04 /
LOCHHEAD, Jonathan Cupertino, 95014 / US | 05 /
KEIGHRAN, Benjamin W. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 06 /
BACHMAN, William M. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 07 /
CHEN, Elbert D. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 08 /
ROBBIN, Jeffrey L Cupertino, 95014 / US | 09 /
FOLSE, Jennifer L. C. Cupertino, 95014 / US | 10 /
KRESS, Lynee San Jose, 95126 / US | 11 /
WESTERHOLD, Kory M Brooklyn, 11201 / US | 12 /
GROMEK, Monika E Cupertino, 95014 / US | 13 /
WOOD, Policarpo, Bonilla, Jr. Cupertino, 95014 / US | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Barton, Russell Glen Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 22173570.7 | 23.06.2015 | [2022/40] | Priority number, date | US201462016600P | 24.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462016600 P | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4068067 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0482, G06F3/0485, G11B27/34, G06F3/0481, // G11B27/031, G11B27/10 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/04812 (US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/0485 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G11B27/031 (EP,CN,US);
G11B27/102 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE ZUR WIEDERGABE VON MUSIK IN DIESEM MOMENT | [2022/40] | English: | MUSIC NOW PLAYING USER INTERFACE | [2022/40] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR DE LECTURE IMMÉDIATE DE MUSIQUE | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 08.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15745282.2 / EP3108350 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004158555 (SEEDMAN MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]EP1705661 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]); | [A]US2007150830 (ORDING BAS [US], et al); | [A]US2008165147 (CHRISTIE GREG [US], et al); | [A]US2013007663 (PIIPPO PETRI MATTI OLAVI [FI]); | [A]US2013346859 (BATES PAUL [US], et al); | [I]US2014123006 (CHEN ELBERT D [US], et al) |