EP4095625 - PREDICTION APPARATUS, PREDICTION METHOD, PREDICTION PROGRAM, AND CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII, Masaki Musashino-shi, Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | 02 /
ENDO, Makoto Musashino-shi, Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | 03 /
MIYAO, Makoto Musashino-shi, Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | 04 /
KARASAWA, Rei Musashino-shi, Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | 05 /
TAKAMI, Go Musashino-shi, Tokyo, 180-8750 / JP | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 22173952.7 | 18.05.2022 | [2022/48] | Priority number, date | JP20210089253 | 27.05.2021 Original published format: JP 2021089253 | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095625 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/02, G05B13/04 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
G05B19/41875 (EP);
G06N20/00 (CN);
G05B13/048 (EP,US);
G05B13/0265 (EP);
G05B13/027 (US);
G05B13/042 (US);
G06N7/01 (US);
H01L21/67017 (CN);
H01L21/67248 (CN);
H01L21/67253 (CN);
G05B2219/32194 (EP);
G05B2219/32201 (EP);
G05B2219/45031 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] |
Former [2022/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORHERSAGEGERÄT, VORHERSAGEVERFAHREN, VORHERSAGEPROGRAMM UND STEUERGERÄT | [2022/48] | English: | PREDICTION APPARATUS, PREDICTION METHOD, PREDICTION PROGRAM, AND CONTROL APPARATUS | [2022/48] | French: | APPAREIL DE PRÉDICTION, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉDICTION, PROGRAMME DE PRÉDICTION ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE | [2022/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 26.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2021002108 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,8,11-13 * abstract * [I] 4,6,7,9,10; | [P]US2022066399 (HASEGAWA MASATAKA [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0002] , [0035] , [0044] - [0054] - [0060] , [0069] , [0073] - [0082] - [0094] - [0096]; figures 1,7-9 * | by applicant | JPS61120427 |