EP4092557 - PARAMETERIZATION OF DIGITAL IRREGULAR FREEFORM GEOMETRIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTCHER, Evan J. Suffield, CT, 06078 / US | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 22174112.7 | 18.05.2022 | [2022/47] | Priority number, date | US202117323116 | 18.05.2021 Original published format: US202117323116 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092557 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F30/10, G06T17/10, G06T17/30 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
G06F30/10 (EP,US);
G06T17/10 (EP);
G06T17/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PARAMETRIERUNG DIGITALER UNGLEICHFÖRMIGER FREIFORMGEOMETRIEN | [2022/47] | English: | PARAMETERIZATION OF DIGITAL IRREGULAR FREEFORM GEOMETRIES | [2022/47] | French: | PARAMÉTRAGE DE GÉOMÉTRIES IRRÉGULIÈRES NUMÉRIQUES DE FORME LIBRE | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 23.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - FRANCESCO BUONAMICI ET AL, "Reverse engineering modeling methods and tools: a survey", COMPUTER-AIDED DESIGN AND APPLICATIONS, (20171116), vol. 15, no. 3, doi:10.1080/16864360.2017.1397894, pages 443 - 464, XP055574952 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 445, column r, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * section 3.2; page 446, column r, paragraph 3 * * page 447, column r, paragraph 2 * * section 3.3 * * section 4.2; page 455, column l, paragraph 3 * * the whole document * [I] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/16864360.2017.1397894 |