EP4280403 - BUSBAR FIXING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies AG Spitalstrasse 5 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2024/39] |
Former [2024/27] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies AG Pestalozzistrasse 2 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2023/47] | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited The Financial Services Centre Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALKOWSKI, Jakub 32-851 Jadowniki / PL | 02 /
OLEK, Pawel 31-421 Kraków / PL | 03 /
KWIATKOWSKI, Pawel 26-600 Radom / PL | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22174605.0 | 20.05.2022 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4280403 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/32, B60R16/02, H02G5/02 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
H02G3/32 (EP);
H02G5/025 (EP,CN);
H01R4/70 (US);
B60R16/0215 (EP,US);
H01R13/2407 (CN);
H01R13/40 (CN);
H01R13/518 (CN);
H01R13/52 (CN);
H01R13/533 (CN);
H01R13/62 (CN);
H01R13/73 (CN);
H01R43/20 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] |
Former [2023/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAMMELSCHIENENBEFESTIGUNG | [2023/47] | English: | BUSBAR FIXING | [2023/47] | French: | FIXATION DE BARRE OMNIBUS | [2023/47] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 16.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2733289 (ROBERT E. WARREN) [X] 1-5,11-13,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010025078 (WAGENER HANS [DE]) [A] 1,15* the whole document *; | [XI]US2011253846 (KATAOKA SHIN [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,10-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [00 8] , [0009] , [0019] - [0035]; figures 1, 3-5 * [I] 8; | [XI]US2013240682 (MARCHE HERVE [FR], et al) [X] 1-7,9,11-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 24] - [0058]; figures 2-5C * [I] 8,10; | [XI]US2017030487 (SAMPSON JAMES M [US]) [X] 1-7,11-15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0031]; figures 1-6 * [I] 10 |