EP4074732 - FULLY HUMAN ANTIBODIES AGAINST OX40, METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wuxi Biologics (Shanghai) Co. Ltd. No. 299 Fute Zhong Road Pudong New District Shanghai 200131 / CN | For all designated states Wuxi Biologics Ireland Limited One Spencer Dock North Wall Quay Dublin 1 / IE | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Yong Shanghai, 200131 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Baotian Shanghai, 200131 / CN | 03 /
LI, Jing Shanghai, 200131 / CN | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 22174660.5 | 07.05.2019 | [2022/42] | Priority number, date | WO2018CN86574 | 11.05.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/086574 | CN201810529840 | 29.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810529840 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4074732 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00, A61P37/00, A61P31/00 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
A61P29/00 (EP,KR);
C07K16/2875 (KR);
C07K16/2878 (EP,CN,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/04 (US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C12N5/163 (EP);
A01K2227/105 (EP);
A01K2267/0331 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/52 (US);
C07K2317/56 (CN);
C07K2317/565 (CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/732 (EP,US);
C07K2317/734 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/75 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] |
Former [2022/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VOLLSTÄNDIG MENSCHLICHE ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN OX40, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2022/42] | English: | FULLY HUMAN ANTIBODIES AGAINST OX40, METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME, AND USE THEREOF | [2022/42] | French: | ANTICORPS ENTIÈREMENT HUMAINS DIRIGÉS CONTRE OX40, MÉTHODE DE PRÉPARATION CORRESPONDANT ET UTILISATION ASSOCIÉE | [2022/42] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 06.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19799456.9 / EP3790903 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03106498 (CRUCELL HOLLAND BV [NL], et al) [I] 1-12 * examples 6-7 *; | [I]WO2009079335 (MEDAREX INC [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * example 1 * * page 52, paragraph 0172 * * page 53, paragraph 0177 - paragraph 0178 * * page 54, paragraph 0182 * * page 55, paragraph 0188 - page 56, paragraph 0192 *; | [I]WO2012027328 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0146] * * figure 20 * * page 7' - page 71; example V *; | [I]WO2014148895 (BIOCEROX PROD BV [NL], et al) [I] 1-12 * page 34, line 12 - line 14 *; | [I]WO2015153513 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * page 126, column 0446 * * page 134, paragraph 0462 * * page 134; table 2 *; | [I]WO2016179517 (AGENUS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * example 1 * * paragraph [0449] * * page 172, paragraph 0457 * * figure 2C * * paragraph [0479] *; | [I]WO2016185016 (ALLIGATOR BIOSCIENCE AB [SE]) [I] 1-12 * examples 3, 6-7 * * tables 3.1, 6.1 * * figure 8 *; | [I]WO2017063162 (DINGFU BIOTARGET CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-12 * page 24; table 3 * * figure 7 * * examples 9, 12 *; | [I]US2018044427 (ARMSTRONG ANTHONY [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0468] * * table 3 * * example 4 * * paragraph [0483] - paragraph [0484] * * example 5 *; | [A] - WILLOUGHBY JANE ET AL, "OX40: Structure and function - What questions remain?", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, (20170113), vol. 83, doi:10.1016/J.MOLIMM.2017.01.006, ISSN 0161-5890, pages 13 - 22, XP029925307 [A] 1-12 * page 19, column l, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2017.01.006 | by applicant | US4399216 | US4634665 | WO8704462 | WO8901036 | EP0338841 | US5179017 | US5500362 | US5545807 | US5545806 | US5569825 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5661016 | US5750373 | US5821337 | US6075181 | US6150584 | WO03048731 | WO03106498 | US8236930 | WO2014093908 | WO2014148895 | US2014308276 | WO2015153513 | WO2016057667 | WO2016179517 | WO2016185016 | WO2017063162 | US2018044427 | - BEERS et al., Clin. Can. Res., (20000000), vol. 6, pages 2835 - 43 | - CLYNES et al., PNAS (USA, (19980000), vol. 95, pages 652 - 656 | - CHOTHIALESK, J. Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - CHOTHIA et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 342, pages 878 - 883 | - SAMBROOK et al., Molecular Cloning: A laboratory Manual, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory Press, (19890000), pages 47 - 51 | - "Genbank", Database accession no. XP _001090870.1 | - GAZZANO-SANTORO et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (19960000), vol. 202, page 163 | - CARILLO et al., SIAMJ. Applied Math., (19880000), vol. 48, page 1073 | - JONSSON, U. et al., Ann. Biol. Clin., (19930000), vol. 51, pages 19 - 26 | - Computer Analysis of Sequence Data, John Wiley & Sons, (19940000), pages 3 - 10 | - JONSSON, U. et al., Biotechniques, (19910000), vol. 11, pages 620 - 627 | - GRAHAM et al., Virology, (19730000), vol. 52, page 456 | - CHU et al., Gene, (19810000), vol. 13, page 197 | - JOHNSSON, B. et al., J. Mol. Recognit., (19950000), vol. 8, pages 125 - 131 | - JOHNNSON, B. et al., Anal. Biochem., (19910000), vol. 198, pages 268 - 277 | - RAVETCHKINET, Annu. Rev. Immunol, (19910000), vol. 9, pages 457 - 92 | - LONBERGHUSZAR, Intern. Rev. Immunol., (19950000), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93 | - BARBAS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 7978 - 7982 | - MORRISON, S., Science, (19850000), vol. 229, page 1202 | - BOERNER et al., J. Immunol, (19910000), vol. 147, no. 1, pages 86 - 95 | - TAKEBE et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (19880000), vol. 8, pages 466 - 472 | - HAMMERLING et al., Monoclonal Antibodies and T-Cell Hybridomas, Elsevier, (19810000), pages 563 - 681 | - "Gene Expression Technology", GOEDDEL, Methods in Enzymology, Academic Press, (19900000), page 185 | - URLAUBCHASIN, Proc. Natl. Acad. ScL USA, (19800000), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220 | - R. J. KAUFMANP. A. SHARP, J. Mol. Biol., (19820000), vol. 159, pages 601 - 621 | - RETTER et al., Nucl. Acids Res, (20050000), vol. 33, pages D671 - D674 | - "Protein Sequence and Structure Analysis of Antibody Variable Domains", DR. ANDREW C. R., Antibody Engineering Lab Manual, Springer-Verlag | - E. MEYERSW. MILLER, Comput. Appl. Biosci., (19880000), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - NEEDLEMANWUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, pages 444 - 453 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (19970000), vol. 25, no. 17, pages 3389 - 3402 | - BRUMMELL et al., Biochem, (19930000), vol. 32, pages 1180 - 1187 | - KOBAYASHI et al., Protein Eng, (19990000), vol. 12, no. 10, pages 879 - 884 | - BURKS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19970000), vol. 94, pages 412 - 417 | - DE WILDT et al., Prot. Eng., (19970000), vol. 10, pages 835 - 41 | - KOMISSAROV et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19970000), vol. 272, pages 26864 - 26870 | - HALL et al., J. Immunol., (19920000), vol. 149, pages 1605 - 12 | - KELLEYO' CONNELL, Biochem., (19930000), vol. 32, pages 6862 - 35 | - ADIB-CONQUY et al., Int. Immunol., (19980000), vol. 10, pages 341 - 6 | - REINEKE, Methods Mol Biol, (20040000), vol. 248, pages 443 - 63 | - TOMER, Protein Science, (20000000), vol. 9, pages 487 - 496 |