EP4279382 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING OPERATION OF AN AIRCRAFT AND CONTROL ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volocopter GmbH Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 2-6, 8, 9 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2024/04] |
Former [2023/47] | For all designated states Volocopter GmbH Zeiloch 20 76646 Bruchsal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Stephan 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Zwiener, Jan 76337 Waldbronn / DE | 03 /
Stephan, Johannes 70176 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22174684.5 | 20.05.2022 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4279382 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B64C39/02, G05D1/08, B64C27/20, B64D27/24 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
B64D27/24 (EP);
B64C27/20 (EP);
B64D31/06 (EP);
B64U50/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] |
Former [2023/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES BETRIEBS EINES FLUGZEUGS UND STEUERUNGSANORDNUNG | [2023/47] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING OPERATION OF AN AIRCRAFT AND CONTROL ARRANGEMENT | [2023/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN AÉRONEF ET AGENCEMENT DE COMMANDE | [2023/47] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 15.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2015180171 (SZ DJI TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [[0056]] , [[0134]]; figure 5 * [A] 2-14; | [XA]US2019152597 (VAN NIEKERK JOHANNES BECKER [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [[0024]] - [[0025]]; figures 1-2 * [A] 2-14; | [A]CN111752291 (XAIRCRAFT CO LTD) [A] 1-14* paragraph [[0057]]; figure 1 *; | [XA]KR20210014830 (UNIV KONKUK IND COOP CORP [KR]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [[0009]] , [[0018]] , [[0061]] , [[0063]] , [[0074]] - paragraph [[0100]]; figure 7 * [A] 4-14; | [XA]US2021216085 (WAKE CHIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [[0139]]; figure 1 * [A] 2-14; | [XA]US11091279 (KWON DENNIS YOUNG [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * columns 6-9; figures 2,7 * [A] 4-14 |