EP4098920 - METHOD FOR MAKING A BULKHEAD ON A BUILDING WALL PENETRATION HAVING A PIPE OR MEDIUM CONDUIT AND CONDUIT SYSTEM WITH SUCH A BULKHEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viega Technology GmbH & Co. KG Viega Platz 1 57439 Attendorn / DE | [2022/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berger, Markus 57462 Olpe-Sondern / DE | [2024/44] |
Former [2022/49] | 01 /
Berger, Markus Olpe-Sondern / DE | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 22175061.5 | 24.05.2022 | [2022/49] | Priority number, date | DE202110114371 | 02.06.2021 Original published format: DE102021114371 | [2022/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4098920 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16L5/04, A62C2/06, H02G3/22, H02G3/04 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
F16L5/04 (EP);
H02G3/0412 (EP);
H02G3/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] |
Former [2022/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER ABSCHOTTUNG AN EINER EINE ROHR- ODER MEDIENLEITUNG AUFWEISENDEN GEBÄUDEWANDUNGSDURCHDRINGUNG UND LEITUNGSSYSTEM MIT EINER SOLCHEN ABSCHOTTUNG | [2022/49] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING A BULKHEAD ON A BUILDING WALL PENETRATION HAVING A PIPE OR MEDIUM CONDUIT AND CONDUIT SYSTEM WITH SUCH A BULKHEAD | [2022/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CLOISONNEMENT SUR UNE TRAVERSÉE DE MUR DE BÂTIMENT COMPRENANT UNE CONDUITE TUBULAIRE OU DE MILIEU ET SYSTÈME DE CONDUITES DOTÉ D'UN TEL CLOISONNEMENT | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 06.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4113375 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]DE19905103 (ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLLE [DE]); | [XAYI]EP1165900 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER AB [SE]); | [Y]WO2004001291 (ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLLE [DE], et al); | [Y]EP1814634 (AIK FLAMMADUR BRANDSCHUTZ GMBH [DE]); | [XAY]EP2633110 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [Y]DE202013100836U (PROMAT GMBH [AT]); | [XAY]RU2705620 (PRUSAKOV VASILIJ ALEKSEEVICH [RU]) | by applicant | EP1236942 |