EP4282340 - INGESTIBLE DEVICE FOR SAMPLING MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 24.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stichting IMEC Nederland Bronland 10 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoeman, Rogier 6708 RD Wageningen / NL | 02 /
Mathwig, Klaus 5611 ND Eindhoven / NL | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22175289.2 | 25.05.2022 | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4282340 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
A61B10/0045 (EP,US);
A61B10/04 (EP);
A61B2010/0061 (EP,US);
A61B2562/162 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] |
Former [2023/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINNEHMBARE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTNAHME VON MATERIALPROBEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [2023/48] | English: | INGESTIBLE DEVICE FOR SAMPLING MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR USING THE SAME | [2023/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF INGÉRABLE POUR MATÉRIAU D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2023/48] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | 23.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]CN1820798 (UNIV CHONGQING [CN]) [X] 1,8,10,11,15 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,7,12,13 [I] 9,14; | [Y]US2009012503 (KAWANO HIRONAO [JP], et al) [Y] 4,7 * figure 2 ** paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0074] *; | [Y]WO2018133660 (GENERAL HOSPITAL OF TIANJIN MEDICAL UNIV [CN]) [Y] 2-4,7 * figures 10-13 * * paragraph [0097] *; | [Y]US2020237349 (DUAN XIAODONG [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,7 * figures 10,11 * * paragraph [0042] *; | [XYI]WO2020193267 (UNIV NAVARRA [ES]) [X] 1,10,11,15 * figures 5,6 * * page 11, line 24 - page 13, line 27 * [Y] 2-4,7,12,13 [I] 9,14 | by applicant | US2021345904 |