EP4105708 - WAVEGUIDE PUPIL EXPANSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR, LV, NO, PL, RS | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Envisics Ltd. Apollo House 6 Bramley Road Milton Keynes MK1 1PT / GB | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTMAS, Jamieson Milton Keynes, MK1 1PT / GB | 02 /
SMEETON, Timothy Milton Keynes, MK1 1PT / GB | 03 /
LIN, Ruisheng Milton Keynes, MK1 1PT / GB | 04 /
KRAWCZYK, Celedonia Milton Keynes, MK1 1PT / GB | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Greenaway, Martin William Apollo House 6 Bramley Road Milton Keynes MK1 1PT / GB | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 22175621.6 | 26.05.2022 | [2022/51] | Priority number, date | GB20210008456 | 14.06.2021 Original published format: GB 202108456 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4105708 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4105708 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/06, G02B30/30, G03H1/08, G03H1/22, G03H1/26, G02B27/00 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G02B30/30 (EP,GB);
G02B27/0172 (GB,KR);
G02B27/0081 (EP,CN,GB,KR);
G02B26/06 (EP,GB);
G03H1/2294 (EP,US);
G02B27/0087 (GB);
G02B27/0093 (KR);
G02B27/0103 (CN,GB,US);
G02B6/003 (KR);
G03B21/14 (CN);
G03H1/02 (KR);
G03H1/2205 (KR);
G03H1/265 (EP,GB);
G02B2027/0105 (GB);
G02B2027/0118 (US);
G02B2027/0123 (CN,GB,US);
G02B2027/0174 (GB,KR);
G02B2027/0187 (KR);
G02B30/28 (EP);
G03H1/0808 (EP);
G03H2001/0224 (GB);
G03H2001/0816 (EP);
G03H2001/2239 (EP);
G03H2001/2284 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Title | German: | WELLENLEITER-PUPILLENERWEITERUNG | [2022/51] | English: | WAVEGUIDE PUPIL EXPANSION | [2022/51] | French: | EXPANSION DE PUPILLE DE GUIDE D'ONDES | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 18.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2784599 (DISNEY ENTPR INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0042]; figures 1A, 1B *; | [A]EP3333617 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0024] - [0042]; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2589575 (ENVISICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0075] - [0077]; figure 6 * | by applicant | GB2498170 | GB2501112 |