EP4112282 - SHAPING METHOD AND SHAPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | [2023/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamato, Homare Tokyo, 100-8332 / JP | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/01] | Application number, filing date | 22175760.2 | 27.05.2022 | [2023/01] | Priority number, date | JP20210106803 | 28.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021106803 | [2023/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4112282 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4112282 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/44, B29C70/54, B29C70/30, B29C70/34 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
B29C70/44 (EP,US);
B29C53/04 (US);
B29C53/82 (US);
B29C70/302 (EP);
B29C70/342 (EP);
B29C70/543 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] |
Former [2023/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FORMGEBUNGSVERFAHREN UND FORMGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/01] | English: | SHAPING METHOD AND SHAPING DEVICE | [2023/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMAGE | [2023/01] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/30] | 20.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005183818 (ZENKNER GRANT C [US], et al) [A] 1-10* figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [XA]US9073256 (DE MATTIA DENIS [FR]) [X] 1,2,7-9 * column 4, line 18 - line 65; figures 3,4; claims 1-3 * [A] 3-6,10 | by applicant | US10336014 | US10688697 |