EP4094711 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CLINICAL WORKSPACE SIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALTER, Max L. Boston, 02210 / US | 02 /
EIDEN, Michael A. Boston, 02210 / US | 03 /
PEINE, William J. Boston, 02210 / US | 04 /
HUSSAIN, Unnas W. Boston, 02210 / US | 05 /
CHEN, Justin R. Boston, 02210 / US | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Maschio & Soames IP Ltd 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/48] | Maschio, Antonio Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | Application number, filing date | 22175900.4 | 27.05.2022 | [2022/48] | Priority number, date | US202163194211P | 28.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163194211 P | US202217735604 | 03.05.2022 Original published format: US202217735604 | [2022/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4094711 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/30, A61B90/00, G06F3/01, A61B34/10, G16H40/60 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
A61B34/30 (EP);
A61B34/10 (EP,CN);
G06T11/00 (US);
A61B90/361 (EP);
A61B90/37 (US);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G16H40/60 (EP);
G16H50/50 (EP);
A61B2034/101 (CN);
A61B2034/102 (EP,US);
A61B2034/107 (US);
A61B2034/108 (CN);
A61B2090/365 (EP,US);
G06T2210/21 (US);
G06T2210/41 (US);
G16H30/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR KLINISCHEN ARBEITSRAUMSIMULATION | [2022/48] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CLINICAL WORKSPACE SIMULATION | [2022/48] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SIMULATION D'ESPACE DE TRAVAIL CLINIQUE | [2022/48] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009144664 (KRAMER JAMES F [US], et al); | [Y]EP3246135 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]); | [X]WO2018032083 (SYNAPTIVE MEDICAL BARBADOS INC [BB], et al); | [XY]WO2019006202 (VERB SURGICAL INC [US]); | [XY]WO2019139931 (COVIDIEN LP [US]); | [X]WO2020260939 (FVRVS LTD [GB]) |