EP4099048 - POSITION INFORMATION CALCULATION DEVICE AND POSITION INFORMATION CALCULATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Infrastructure Systems & Solutions Corporation 72-34, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/49] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Infrastructure Systems & Solutions Corporation 72-34, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASHIMA, Yoshiki Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Hiroyuki Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
OODAKE, Tatsuya Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Yusuke Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
KATO, Noriyasu Kanagawa / JP | 06 /
HATTORI, Yohei Kanagawa / JP | 07 /
ITO, Hiroaki Kanagawa / JP | [2022/49] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2022/49] | Application number, filing date | 22176261.0 | 31.05.2022 | [2022/49] | Priority number, date | JP20210094099 | 04.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021094099 | [2022/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4099048 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/48, G01S17/931, G01S5/16, G01C21/36 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
G01S5/16 (EP);
G06F16/2455 (CN);
B61L25/025 (CN);
G01C21/20 (CN);
G01C21/30 (EP);
G01C21/3602 (EP);
G01S17/88 (EP);
G06F16/29 (CN);
G06F16/90348 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIONSINFORMATIONSBERECHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND POSITIONSINFORMATIONSBERECHNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/49] | English: | POSITION INFORMATION CALCULATION DEVICE AND POSITION INFORMATION CALCULATION METHOD | [2022/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CALCUL D'INFORMATIONS DE POSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE CALCUL D'INFORMATIONS DE POSITION | [2022/49] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 07.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013155222 (MIN KYOUNG-WOOK [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0060] * [I] 4-9; | [XI]FR3036498 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,10 * the whole document * [I] 4-9; | [XI]US2018045519 (GHADIOK VAIBHAV [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0080] *[I] 4-9 |