EP4070787 - PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOZIARA, Joanna, M. Foster City, 94404 / US | 02 /
MCCALLISTER, Scott Foster City, 94404 / US | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 22176524.1 | 29.06.2016 | [2022/41] | Priority number, date | US201562187113P | 30.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562187113 P | US201662298373P | 22.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662298373 P | US201662301429P | 29.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662301429 P | US201662317286P | 01.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662317286 P | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070787 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4070787 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/24, A61K31/513, A61K31/675, A61K9/00, A61K9/28 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
A61K9/2054 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0053 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/2013 (KR,US);
A61K9/209 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/284 (KR,US);
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Extension states | BA | 31.05.2022 | ME | 31.05.2022 | Validation states | MA | 31.05.2022 | MD | 31.05.2022 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN | [2022/41] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL FORMULATIONS | [2022/41] | French: | FORMULATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2022/41] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 29.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16739625.8 / EP3316868 | EP19199257.7 / EP3607939 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.11.2023
30.11.2023
ADMISSIBLE Zentiva, k.s. U kabelovny 130 102 37 Praha 10 - Dolni Mecholupy / CZ Opponent's representative Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.11.2023
30.11.2023
ADMISSIBLE Zentiva, k.s. U kabelovny 130 102 37 Praha 10 - Dolni Mecholupy / CZ Opponent's representative Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | ||
Former [2024/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.11.2023
30.11.2023
ADMISSIBLE Zentiva, k.s. U kabelovny 130 102 37 Praha 10 - Dolni Mecholupy / CZ Opponent's representative Ellis, Robin Patrick Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | 13.12.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.04.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.02.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 01.03.2023 | EE | 01.03.2023 | FI | 01.03.2023 | HR | 01.03.2023 | LT | 01.03.2023 | LV | 01.03.2023 | MC | 01.03.2023 | RO | 01.03.2023 | RS | 01.03.2023 | SM | 01.03.2023 | LU | 29.06.2023 | IS | 01.07.2023 | [2024/15] |
Former [2024/09] | DK | 01.03.2023 | |
EE | 01.03.2023 | ||
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
MC | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | EE | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 01.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | EE | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RO | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 01.03.2023 | |
FI | 01.03.2023 | ||
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
SM | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 01.03.2023 | |
HR | 01.03.2023 | ||
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
LV | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 01.03.2023 | |
LT | 01.03.2023 | ||
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 01.03.2023 | |
RS | 01.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 01.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2013116720 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]); | [I]WO2015022351 (RATIOPHARM GMBH [DE]); | [PA]WO2015196116 (GILEAD SCIENCES INC [US]); | by applicant | WO0208241 | WO03016306 | WO2013025788 | Opposition | US2007077295 | WO2013025788 | EP1583542 |