EP4102570 - CAMERA MODULE, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND VEHICLE INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Largan Precision Co. Ltd. No. 11, Jingke Rd. Nantun District Taichung City 408 / TW | [2022/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSAI, Wen-Yu 408 Taichung City / TW | 02 /
CHANG, Chien-Pang 408 Taichung City / TW | 03 /
CHANG, Lin-An 408 Taichung City / TW | 04 /
CHOU, Ming-Ta 408 Taichung City / TW | 05 /
LIN, Cheng-Fen 408 Taichung City / TW | 06 /
CHU, Kuo-Chiang 408 Taichung City / TW | [2022/50] | Representative(s) | Jakelski & Althoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Mollenbachstraße 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2022/50] | Application number, filing date | 22176671.0 | 01.06.2022 | [2022/50] | Priority number, date | US202163209016P | 10.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163209016 P | TW20210137630 | 08.10.2021 Original published format: TW 110137630 | [2022/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4102570 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4102570 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
H01L27/14627 (EP);
H04N23/54 (KR,US);
G02B1/11 (CN);
H04N23/55 (KR,US);
G02B1/115 (US);
G02B1/14 (CN);
G02B3/0006 (CN);
G03B17/12 (CN);
H01L27/1462 (EP,KR);
H01L27/14621 (EP);
H01L27/14625 (KR);
H04N23/57 (US);
H01L27/14618 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAMERAMODUL, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND FAHRZEUGINSTRUMENT | [2022/50] | English: | CAMERA MODULE, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND VEHICLE INSTRUMENT | [2022/50] | French: | MODULE DE CAMÉRA, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET INSTRUMENT DE VÉHICULE | [2022/50] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/50] | 14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008028984 (MEREDITH WILLIAM A [US], et al); | [XI]JP2016057335 (SONY CORP); | [A]EP3407386 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US2020408598 (TODA ATSUSHI [JP], et al); |